House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 127
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 392: yeas 89, nays 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 86, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Buck, Gaskill, Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Miller K) failed; Roll Call 99: yeas 31, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Smaltz) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Representatives Pressel, Miller D, Abbott D added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Representative Smaltz
|
|
|