House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 65
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 320: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Senator Johnson added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Walker G added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 87: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Walker K
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Representative Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Representatives Lauer and Olthoff added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Representative Schaibley
|
|
|