Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1176 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/10/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1176
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 31-34-19-11.
Synopsis:  CHINS dispositional hearing data. Requires the department
of child services to prepare a report containing certain information for
all cases in which a parent, guardian, or custodian has been ordered to
participate in the plan of care for a child.
Effective:  July 1, 2023.
Lauer
January 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Family, Children and
Human Affairs.
2023	IN 1176—LS 6836/DI 149 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1176
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
family law and juvenile law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 31-34-19-11 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA
2 CODE AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS
3 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 11. (a) This section applies to a
4 case in which a parent, guardian, or custodian has been ordered to
5 participate in the plan of care for a child in a dispositional decree
6 under section 10 of this chapter.
7 (b) For a case to which this section applies, the department shall
8 prepare a report that contains the following information for each
9 state fiscal year, beginning on July 1, 2023:
10 (1) The elapsed time between the date a court finds that a
11 child is a child in need of services and the date that a
12 dispositional hearing is completed under section 1 of this
13 chapter.
14 (2) The elapsed time between the date the court finds that a
15 child is a child in need of services and the date that a
16 permanency hearing is completed under IC 31-34-21-7.
17 (3) The elapsed time between the date a dispositional decree
2023	IN 1176—LS 6836/DI 149 2
1 is entered under section 6 of this chapter and the date of a
2 modification hearing held under IC 31-34-23 to modify
3 services related to the participation by the parent, guardian,
4 or custodian in the plan of care for the child in the
5 dispositional decree.
6 (4) The elapsed time between the date the dispositional decree
7 is entered and the date that a parent, guardian, or custodian
8 completes services that are ordered in the dispositional decree
9 or modified decree.
10 (5) Any other information that the department believes to be
11 relevant.
12 (c) The report may not disclose any personal, identifiable
13 information.
14 (d) The department shall submit the report to the legislative
15 council before August 1, 2024, and before August 1 of each year
16 thereafter. The report shall be submitted an electronic format
17 under IC 5-14-6.
2023	IN 1176—LS 6836/DI 149