Senate | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 86, nays 7 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L, Buchanan, Garten | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative Clere | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Coauthored by Representatives Miller D, Zent, Fleming |