Senate | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 92, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Representatives Meltzer J, Gore M, Ledbetter C added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative McNamara |