House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 220
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 521: yeas 40, nays 10
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 541: yeas 90, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Representative Manning added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Representative Bartels removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Taylor G and Koch
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Pol
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Miller D, Lehman, Campbell and Pierce K
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Bartels and Bartlett
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 368: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 97, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Garten
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Representative Pierce K added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Representative Jordan added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Campbell) failed; Roll Call 10: yeas 28, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Authored by Representative Bartels
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller D
|
|
|