Senate | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 73: yeas 97, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Representatives Steuerwald, Jeter C, GiaQuinta added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Representative GiaQuinta removed as coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |