Senate | 03/23/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 231: yeas 93, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Coauthored by Representatives Engleman, Cash, Summers | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative Olthoff |