Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senators Walker K and Breaux added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 94, nays 3 | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Alting and Busch | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Representative Clere added as coauthor | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Representative Johnson added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/12/2023 | Representative Bartels added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative Manning |