Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1222 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/10/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1222
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 9-18.5-23-3; IC 10-15; IC 10-19;
IC 22-11-14-12; IC 22-14-6; IC 36-8-10.6-5.
Synopsis:  Regional public safety training fund. Establishes the
regional public safety training fund (fund). Provides that the fund is
administered by the department of homeland security. Transfers
proceeds from the Indiana homeland security fund and the fire training
infrastructure fund to the fund. Repeals provisions relating to the
establishment of the: (1) Indiana homeland security foundation; (2)
Indiana homeland security fund; and (3) fire training infrastructure
fund.
Effective:  Upon passage; July 1, 2023.
Frye R
January 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
2023	IN 1222—LS 6410/DI 116 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1222
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
public safety.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 9-18.5-23-3, AS AMENDED BY P.L.118-2022,
2 SECTION 15, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 3. (a) The fees for a first responder license plate
4 are as follows:
5 (1) An annual supplemental fee of fifteen dollars ($15) under
6 IC 9-18.5-12-16.
7 (2) An annual fee of not more than twenty-five dollars ($25) as
8 provided in IC 9-18.5-12-14(d)(2) or IC 9-18.5-12-15(b).
9 (b) The annual fee referred to in subsection (a)(2) shall be collected
10 by the bureau and deposited in the regional public safety training
11 fund established under IC 10-15-3-1. by IC 10-19-9.1-1.
12 (c) The bureau shall distribute at least one (1) time each month the
13 money from the fund collected under subsection (b).
14 SECTION 2. IC 10-15 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY 1,
15 2023]. (INDIANA HOMELAND SECURITY FOUNDATION).
16 SECTION 3. IC 10-19-1-6 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
17 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
2023	IN 1222—LS 6410/DI 116 2
1 1, 2023]: Sec. 6. "Fund", for purposes of IC 10-19-9.1, refers to the
2 regional public safety training fund established by IC 10-19-9.1-1.
3 SECTION 4. IC 10-19-9.1 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
4 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
5 JULY 1, 2023]:
6 Chapter 9.1. Regional Public Safety Training Fund
7 Sec. 1. (a) The regional public safety training fund is established
8 to:
9 (1) provide regional and advanced training for public safety
10 service providers, including fire investigation training;
11 (2) fund the design, procurement, and construction of
12 firefighter training facilities;
13 (3) provide scholarships for students enrolled in
14 postsecondary courses focused on public safety; or
15 (4) purchase equipment to enhance emergency preparedness
16 and response capabilities of:
17 (A) a public safety agency (as defined in IC 10-10.5-1-5); or
18 (B) an emergency medical services provider organization
19 certified by the Indiana emergency medical services
20 commission under rules adopted under IC 16-31-3.
21 (b) The department shall administer the fund. The expenses of
22 administering the fund shall be paid from money in the fund.
23 (c) The fund consists of the following:
24 (1) Public safety fees deposited under IC 22-11-14-12(c)(1).
25 (2) Money transferred from the statewide arson investigation
26 financial assistance fund under IC 22-12-6-2(c) (before its
27 expiration).
28 (3) Money appropriated by the general assembly.
29 (4) Donations, gifts, and money received from any other
30 source, including transfers from other funds or accounts.
31 (5) Money transferred from the Indiana homeland security
32 fund established under IC 10-15-3-1 (before its repeal).
33 (6) Money transferred from the fire training infrastructure
34 fund established under IC 22-14-6-1 (before its repeal).
35 (d) The treasurer of state shall invest the money in the fund not
36 currently needed to meet the obligations of the fund in the same
37 manner as other public money may be invested. Interest that
38 accrues from the investments shall be deposited in the fund.
39 (e) Money in the fund at the end of a state fiscal year does not
40 revert to the state general fund.
41 SECTION 5. IC 22-11-14-12, AS AMENDED BY P.L.170-2022,
42 SECTION 35, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
2023	IN 1222—LS 6410/DI 116 3
1 JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 12. (a) A user fee, known as the public safety fee,
2 is imposed on retail transactions made in Indiana of fireworks, in
3 accordance with section 13 of this chapter.
4 (b) A person who acquires fireworks in a retail transaction is liable
5 for the public safety fee on the transaction and, except as otherwise
6 provided in this chapter, shall pay the public safety fee to the retailer
7 as a separate added amount to the consideration in the transaction. The
8 retailer shall collect the public safety fee as an agent for the state.
9 (c) The public safety fee shall be deposited in the state general fund.
10 The auditor of state shall annually transfer the money received from the
11 public safety fee as follows:
12 (1) Two million dollars ($2,000,000) shall be deposited in the
13 regional public safety training fund established by IC 10-15-3-12.
14 IC 10-19-9.1-1.
15 (2) Any additional money received shall be deposited evenly
16 between the state disaster relief fund established by IC 10-14-4-5
17 and the regional public safety training fund described in
18 subdivision (1).
19 (d) The department of state revenue shall adopt rules under
20 IC 4-22-2 necessary for the collection of the public safety fee money
21 from retailers as described in subsections (b) and (c).
22 SECTION 6. IC 22-14-6 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY 1,
23 2023]. (Fire Training Infrastructure Fund).
24 SECTION 7. IC 36-8-10.6-5, AS ADDED BY P.L.187-2021,
25 SECTION 144, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
26 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 5. The department shall do the
27 following:
28 (1) Develop curriculum for the executive training program.
29 (2) Offer an executive training program, either in person or by
30 electronic means, at least two (2) times per year.
31 (3) Pay any costs of the executive training program out of the
32 regional public safety training fund established by IC 10-15-3-12.
33 IC 10-19-9.1-1.
34 (4) Provide a certificate of completion to any fire service
35 personnel who complete the executive training program offered
36 by the department.
37 SECTION 8. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) Any balance in
38 the Indiana homeland security fund established by IC 10-15-3-1, as
39 repealed by this act, shall be transferred to the regional public
40 safety training fund established by IC 10-19-9.1-1, as added by this
41 act, on June 30, 2023. Any revenue that would otherwise be
42 deposited in the Indiana homeland security fund on or after June
2023	IN 1222—LS 6410/DI 116 4
1 30, 2023, shall be deposited in the regional public safety training
2 fund established by IC 10-19-9.1-1, as added by this act.
3 (b) Any balance in the fire training infrastructure fund
4 established by IC 22-14-6-2, as repealed by this act, shall be
5 transferred to the regional public safety training fund established
6 by IC 10-19-9.1-1, as added by this act, on June 30, 2023.
7 (c) This SECTION expires July 1, 2024.
8 SECTION 9. An emergency is declared for this act.
2023	IN 1222—LS 6410/DI 116