House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 222
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 496: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 507: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D. and Buck
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Alting and Pol
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Clere, Abbott and Miller K
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Lehman and Pierce M
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Alting) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Alting and Hunley
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Representative Miller D added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Representative Clere added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pierce M
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Lehman
|
|
|