House | 04/20/2023 | Public Law 71 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senator Taylor G added as cosponsor | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 154: yeas 96, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Johnson and Leising | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Representative Garcia Wilburn V added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Representative Vermilion A added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authored by Representative Meltzer | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Lauer |