House | 04/20/2023 | Public Law 73 | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 372: yeas 89, nays 0 | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Motion to concur filed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Returned to the House with amendments | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 41, nays 2 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Amendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senator Bohacek added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 94, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authored by Representative VanNatter |