House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 228
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 543: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 519: yeas 47, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senator Crider added as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Breaux and Brown L
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Donato and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Clere, Greene, O'Brien and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Olthoff and Summers
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 370: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senators Niezgodski and Breaux added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Becker added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Brown L added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Breaux removed as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Becker removed as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senator Breaux added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Senator Becker added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 242: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Donato
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Representative O'Brien T added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Reassigned to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Olthoff
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Clere and Greene
|
|
|