House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 230
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Representative Morris added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 481: yeas 93, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 437: yeas 39, nays 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senators Donato and Breaux added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 108: yeas 99, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Leising and Messmer
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Representatives Karickhoff and Klinker added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Ledbetter
|
|
|