Senate | 02/27/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Representative Fleming added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 96, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Representative Schaibley added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Authored by Representative King | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Barrett |