Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1395 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/17/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1395
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 16-41-21.2.
Synopsis:  Radon testing in school buildings. Requires the individual
or entity having authority over a public school building to test for radon
in the lowest level of the school building before January 1, 2026, and
report the test results to the Indiana department of health (state
department). Requires the state department to record the test results in
a data base and use the data base in its efforts to reduce the health risks
of radon.
Effective:  July 1, 2023.
Andrade, Boy
January 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
2023	IN 1395—LS 6557/DI 150 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1395
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
environmental law.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 16-41-21.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2023]:
4 Chapter 21.2. Radon in School Buildings
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "radon" refers to the colorless,
6 odorless, and tasteless radioactive gas that:
7 (1) forms naturally when radioactive metals break down in:
8 (A) rocks;
9 (B) soil; or
10 (C) ground water;
11 (2) can enter homes and other buildings; and
12 (3) is a recognized cause of lung cancer.
13 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "school building" means any
14 building:
15 (1) that is used by a public school (as defined in
16 IC 20-18-2-15(2)), including a charter school (as defined in
17 IC 20-18-2-2.5); and
2023	IN 1395—LS 6557/DI 150 2
1 (2) in which:
2 (A) classroom instruction of students occurs; or
3 (B) students are present for any period during a school
4 day.
5 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "student" refers to a student in
6 any grade from kindergarten through grade 12.
7 Sec. 4. (a) The individual or entity having authority over a
8 school building shall test the air in the lowest level of the school
9 building before January 1, 2026, to determine whether the
10 concentration of radon in the air equals or exceeds the United
11 States Environmental Protection Agency's recommended action
12 level of four (4) picocuries per liter.
13 (b) The individual or entity having authority over a school
14 building that is subject to radon testing under this section shall
15 seek any state or federal grant money that is available to pay the
16 cost of the testing.
17 Sec. 5. (a) The person or entity having authority over a school
18 building shall report to the state department the results of the
19 radon testing conducted in the school building under section 4 of
20 this chapter.
21 (b) The state department shall:
22 (1) record the test results reported under subsection (a) in a
23 data base; and
24 (2) use the data base in its efforts to reduce the health risks of
25 radon.
2023	IN 1395—LS 6557/DI 150