House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 232
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 509: yeas 44, nays 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 526: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Niezgodski and Perfect
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Morris, Morrison, Bauer M and Jackson
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Pressel and Errington
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Niemeyer and Perfect
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Representative Miller D added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Pressel
|
|
|