1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1409 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 6-3.6-9-15. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Local income tax excess balance. Requires the budget |
---|
8 | 8 | | agency to make a supplemental distribution to a county from the |
---|
9 | 9 | | county's trust account if the budget agency determines that the balance |
---|
10 | 10 | | in the county's trust account exceeds 11% (which is a decrease from |
---|
11 | 11 | | 15% under current law) of the certified distributions to be made to the |
---|
12 | 12 | | county in a determination year. Provides that the amount of the |
---|
13 | 13 | | supplemental distribution is equal to the amount by which: (1) the |
---|
14 | 14 | | balance in the county trust account; minus (2) the amount of any |
---|
15 | 15 | | supplemental or special distribution that has not yet been accounted for |
---|
16 | 16 | | in the last known balance of the county's trust account; exceeds 11% |
---|
17 | 17 | | (which is a decrease from 15% under current law) of the certified |
---|
18 | 18 | | distributions to be made to the county in the determination year. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Effective: January 1, 2023 (retroactive); January 1, 2024. |
---|
20 | 20 | | Smaltz |
---|
21 | 21 | | January 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means. |
---|
22 | 22 | | 2023 IN 1409—LS 7009/DI 134 Introduced |
---|
23 | 23 | | First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023) |
---|
24 | 24 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
25 | 25 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
26 | 26 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
28 | 28 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
29 | 29 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
30 | 30 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
32 | 32 | | between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
33 | 33 | | HOUSE BILL No. 1409 |
---|
34 | 34 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning |
---|
35 | 35 | | taxation. |
---|
36 | 36 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
37 | 37 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-3.6-9-15, AS AMENDED BY P.L.257-2019, |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2 SECTION 73, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
39 | 39 | | 3 JANUARY 1, 2024]: Sec. 15. (a) If the budget agency determines that |
---|
40 | 40 | | 4 the balance in a county trust account exceeds fifteen percent (15%) |
---|
41 | 41 | | 5 eleven percent (11%) of the certified distributions to be made to the |
---|
42 | 42 | | 6 county in the determination year, the budget agency shall make a |
---|
43 | 43 | | 7 supplemental distribution to the county from the county's trust account. |
---|
44 | 44 | | 8 The budget agency shall use the trust account balance as of December |
---|
45 | 45 | | 9 31 of the year that precedes the determination year by two (2) years |
---|
46 | 46 | | 10 (referred to as the "trust account balance year" in this section). |
---|
47 | 47 | | 11 (b) A supplemental distribution described in subsection (a) must be: |
---|
48 | 48 | | 12 (1) made at the same time as the determinations are provided to |
---|
49 | 49 | | 13 the county auditor under subsection (d)(3); and |
---|
50 | 50 | | 14 (2) allocated in the same manner as certified distributions for the |
---|
51 | 51 | | 15 purposes described in this article. |
---|
52 | 52 | | 16 (c) The amount of a supplemental distribution described in |
---|
53 | 53 | | 17 subsection (a) is equal to the amount by which: |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2023 IN 1409—LS 7009/DI 134 2 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 1 (1) the balance in the county trust account; minus |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2 (2) the amount of any supplemental or special distribution that has |
---|
57 | 57 | | 3 not yet been accounted for in the last known balance of the |
---|
58 | 58 | | 4 county's trust account; |
---|
59 | 59 | | 5 exceeds fifteen percent (15%) eleven percent (11%) of the certified |
---|
60 | 60 | | 6 distributions to be made to the county in the determination year. |
---|
61 | 61 | | 7 (d) For a county that qualifies for a supplemental distribution under |
---|
62 | 62 | | 8 this section in a year, the following apply: |
---|
63 | 63 | | 9 (1) Before February 15, the budget agency shall update the |
---|
64 | 64 | | 10 information described in section 9 of this chapter to include the |
---|
65 | 65 | | 11 excess account balances to be distributed under this section. |
---|
66 | 66 | | 12 (2) Before May 2, the budget agency shall provide the amount of |
---|
67 | 67 | | 13 the supplemental distribution for the county to the department of |
---|
68 | 68 | | 14 local government finance and to the county auditor. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 15 (3) The department of local government finance shall determine |
---|
70 | 70 | | 16 for the county and each taxing unit within the county: |
---|
71 | 71 | | 17 (A) the amount and allocation of the supplemental distribution |
---|
72 | 72 | | 18 attributable to the taxes that were imposed as of December 31 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 19 of the trust account balance year, including any specific |
---|
74 | 74 | | 20 distributions for that year; and |
---|
75 | 75 | | 21 (B) the amount of the allocation for each of the purposes set |
---|
76 | 76 | | 22 forth in this article, using the allocation percentages in effect |
---|
77 | 77 | | 23 in the trust account balance year. |
---|
78 | 78 | | 24 The department of local government finance shall provide these |
---|
79 | 79 | | 25 determinations to the county auditor before May 16 of the |
---|
80 | 80 | | 26 determination year. |
---|
81 | 81 | | 27 (4) Before June 1, the county auditor shall distribute to each |
---|
82 | 82 | | 28 taxing unit the amount of the supplemental distribution that is |
---|
83 | 83 | | 29 allocated to the taxing unit under subdivision (3). |
---|
84 | 84 | | 30 For determinations before 2019, the tax rates in effect under and the |
---|
85 | 85 | | 31 allocation methods specified in the former income tax laws shall be |
---|
86 | 86 | | 32 used for the determinations under subdivision (3). |
---|
87 | 87 | | 33 (e) For any part of a supplemental distribution attributable to |
---|
88 | 88 | | 34 property tax credits under a former income tax or IC 6-3.6-5, the |
---|
89 | 89 | | 35 adopting body for the county may allocate the supplemental |
---|
90 | 90 | | 36 distribution to property tax credits for not more than the three (3) years |
---|
91 | 91 | | 37 after the year the supplemental distribution is received. |
---|
92 | 92 | | 38 (f) Any income earned on money held in a trust account established |
---|
93 | 93 | | 39 for a county under this chapter shall be deposited in that trust account. |
---|
94 | 94 | | 40 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2023 (RETROACTIVE)] |
---|
95 | 95 | | 41 (a) IC 6-3.6-9-15, as amended by this act, applies to taxable years |
---|
96 | 96 | | 42 beginning after December 31, 2023. |
---|
97 | 97 | | 2023 IN 1409—LS 7009/DI 134 3 |
---|
98 | 98 | | 1 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2026. |
---|
99 | 99 | | 2 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act. |
---|
100 | 100 | | 2023 IN 1409—LS 7009/DI 134 |
---|