House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 81
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 293: yeas 33, nays 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senator Perfect added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Yoder) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 68, nays 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Koch
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Soliday) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Representative Frye added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Soliday
|
|
|