House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 84
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 344: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Young M) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 243: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Doriot, Garten, Buck
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Wesco added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative Miller D
|
|
|