House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 151
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 445: yeas 32, nays 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 132: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Representatives Klinker and Morrison added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Representative McNamara
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|