Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Breaux removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senator Busch added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Senator Melton added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Becker added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senators Walker K and Niezgodski added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 77, nays 21
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Messmer and Alting
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Jeter
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Soliday, Steuerwald, Moed
|
|
|