Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1565 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/19/2023

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1565
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 9-24-11.
Synopsis:  Indicia of firearms restrictions on license. Provides that the
bureau of motor vehicles, when issuing a driver's license or learner's
permit, shall place an identifying symbol in a prominent location on the
driver's license or learner's permit of an individual prohibited from
carrying a handgun to indicate that the individual is prohibited from
carrying a handgun.
Effective:  July 1, 2023.
Rowray
January 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
2023	IN 1565—LS 6287/DI 139 Introduced
First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1565
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
motor vehicles.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 9-24-11-5, AS AMENDED BY P.L.120-2020,
2 SECTION 28, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 5. (a) Except as provided in subsection (d), a
4 learner's permit or driver's license issued under this article must contain
5 the following information:
6 (1) The full legal name of the permittee or licensee.
7 (2) The date of birth of the permittee or licensee.
8 (3) The address of the principal residence of the permittee or
9 licensee.
10 (4) The hair color and eye color of the permittee or licensee.
11 (5) The date of issue and expiration date of the permit or license.
12 (6) The gender of the permittee or licensee.
13 (7) The unique identifying number of the permit or license.
14 (8) The weight of the permittee or licensee.
15 (9) The height of the permittee or licensee.
16 (10) A reproduction of the signature of the permittee or licensee.
17 (11) If the permittee or licensee is less than eighteen (18) years of
2023	IN 1565—LS 6287/DI 139 2
1 age at the time of issuance, the dates, notated prominently, on
2 which the permittee or licensee will become:
3 (A) eighteen (18) years of age; and
4 (B) twenty-one (21) years of age.
5 (12) If the permittee or licensee is at least eighteen (18) years of
6 age but less than twenty-one (21) years of age at the time of
7 issuance, the date, notated prominently, on which the permittee or
8 licensee will become twenty-one (21) years of age.
9 (13) Except as provided in subsection (b), a digital photograph of
10 the permittee or licensee.
11 (14) An identifying symbol that notates that the permittee or
12 licensee is prohibited from carrying a handgun as described
13 in section 6.5 of this chapter, if applicable.
14 (b) The bureau may provide for the omission of a photograph or
15 computerized image from any driver's license or learner's permit if
16 there is good cause for the omission. However, a driver's license or
17 learner's permit issued without a digital photograph must include a
18 statement that indicates that the driver's license or learner's permit may
19 not be accepted by a federal agency for federal identification or any
20 other federal purpose.
21 (c) A driver's license or learner's permit issued to an individual who:
22 (1) has a valid, unexpired nonimmigrant visa or has nonimmigrant
23 visa status for entry in the United States;
24 (2) has a pending application for asylum in the United States;
25 (3) has a pending or approved application for temporary protected
26 status in the United States;
27 (4) has approved deferred action status; or
28 (5) has a pending application for adjustment of status to that of an
29 alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence in the United
30 States or conditional permanent residence status in the United
31 States;
32 must be clearly identified as a temporary driver's license or learner's
33 permit. A temporary driver's license or learner's permit issued under
34 this subsection may not be renewed without the presentation of valid
35 documentary evidence proving that the licensee's or permittee's
36 temporary status has been extended.
37 (d) For purposes of subsection (a), an individual certified as a
38 program participant in the address confidentiality program under
39 IC 5-26.5 is not required to provide the address of the individual's
40 principal residence, but may provide an address designated by the
41 office of the attorney general under IC 5-26.5 as the address of the
42 individual's principal residence.
2023	IN 1565—LS 6287/DI 139 3
1 (e) Notwithstanding the July 1, 2021, effective date in HEA
2 1506-2019, SECTION 49 (P.L.178-2019), this section takes effect July
3 1, 2020 (rather than July 1, 2021).
4 SECTION 2. IC 9-24-11-6.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
5 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
6 1, 2023]: Sec. 6.5. (a) This section applies to an individual who is
7 prohibited from carrying a handgun as described in IC 35-47-2-1.5.
8 (b) The bureau, when issuing a driver's license or learner's
9 permit, shall place an identifying symbol in a prominent location
10 on the driver's license or learner's permit of an individual
11 described in subsection (a) to indicate that the individual is
12 prohibited from carrying a handgun. The bureau shall include
13 information on the individual's driver's license or learner's permit
14 that briefly describes why the individual is prohibited from
15 carrying a handgun. The information must be notated in a manner
16 that alerts a person reading the driver's license or learner's permit
17 to the fact that the individual is prohibited from carrying a
18 handgun.
2023	IN 1565—LS 6287/DI 139