House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 154
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 28, nays 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Senator Breaux added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 86, nays 12
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Cosponsor: Senator Alexander
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Glick, Leising, Becker
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Negele) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Rowray
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Negele, Vermilion, Fleming
|
|
|