House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 249
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 536: yeas 66, nays 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 513: yeas 29, nays 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Miller D added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Campbell removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Miller D removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senator Koch added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senator Pol removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senator Koch removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Taylor G and Koch
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Pol
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Miller D, Lehman and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Bartels and Campbell
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senator Johnson added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 426: yeas 30, nays 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 366: yeas 20, nays 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #5 (Walker K) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #6 (Garten) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 169: yeas 73, nays 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Garten
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Boy) failed; Roll Call 143: yeas 27, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Representatives Miller D and Jordan added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Bartels
|
|
|