House
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 160
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 463: yeas 66, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Clere, McGuire, Pfaff and Smith V
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 385: yeas 37, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 66, nays 24
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment #2 (DeLaney) motion withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment #3 (McGuire) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Representative Clere added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Behning
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Goodrich and Teshka
|
|
|