House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 250
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 528: yeas 42, nays 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 549: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Qaddoura and Crane
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Hunley
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Davis, Teshka and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 454: yeas 40, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Hunley) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Crane
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 247: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Representative Jordan added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Behning
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Davis and Smith V
|
|
|