House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 252
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 522: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 544: yeas 93, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Yoder and Byrne
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Niezgodski
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Soliday, Jeter, Pressel and Bauer M
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Morris and Errington
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 39, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Byrne, Garten, Niezgodski
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 248: yeas 75, nays 19
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Morris) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Representatives Soliday, Pressel, Judy added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Representative Morris
|
|
|