Senate | 03/01/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 89, nays 1 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Taylor G | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Representative Moed added as coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Authored by Representative Morris | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Coauthored by Representatives McNamara and Baird |