Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Public Law 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Representatives DeLaney and Porter added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 151: yeas 98, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 144: yeas 28, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Representative Thompson added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Snow
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senator Buchanan added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Holdman removed as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Senators Ford Jon, Rogers, Walker K added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senators Baldwin, Garten, Holdman
|
|
|