Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 163
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 535: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 562: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Heine, Prescott and Harris
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Thompson and Porter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Niezgodski and Baldwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 98, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Heine, Lehman, Prescott
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 166: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 151: yeas 9, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Senator Garten added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|