Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Public Law 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senator Randolph removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 247: yeas 29, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 64, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Pierce) failed; Roll Call 265: yeas 29, nays 60
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Representative Frye added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Manning added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Soliday
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Tomes added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Senators Leising and Glick
|
|
|