Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 167
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 501: yeas 37, nays 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 530: yeas 92, nays 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Melton and Perfect
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Niezgodski
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Lehman, Bartels, Morris, GiaQuinta and Miller K
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Manning and Moed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 381: yeas 79, nays 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Moed) failed; Roll Call 364: yeas 33, nays 58
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Representative Lyness added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Rule 105.1 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Meltzer J added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives GiaQuinta and Miller K
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Lehman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 39, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Perfect added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Rogers added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Brown L
|
|
|