Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Public Law 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 258: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Rowray E added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative McNamara
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Senators Freeman, Sandlin, Koch, Glick added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
Senator Walker K added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Crider
|
|
|