House
|
03/13/2023
|
Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Frye and Olthoff
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Slager
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 48, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senator Dernulc added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Senator Charbonneau added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Niemeyer
|
|
|