House | 03/06/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senator Crane added as third author | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 178: yeas 40, nays 9 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senator Crider added as second author | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Committee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Koch |