House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/01/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senator Pol added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senator Alting added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | House sponsor: Representative May | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 44, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Senator Buck added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/09/2023 | Authored by Senator Koch |