Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senator Walker K added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senators Bohacek and Walker G added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senator Donato added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senators Bassler and Alting added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senator Messmer added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Rogers added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Niezgodski added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Authored by Senator Doriot |