Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 103
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 352: yeas 93, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Representative Goodrich added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Representative Pryor added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Donato added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Cosponsor: Representative Pfaff
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Clere
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 45, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senators Ford J.D. and Breaux added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Becker added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Walker G added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Senator Ford Jon
|
|
|