Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 178
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 489: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 508: yeas 90, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Yoder and Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House advisors appointed: King, Hostettler, Ledbetter and Hatfield
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Zent and Fleming
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 430: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Representatives Heaton and Fleming added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Mayfield) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Representative King J added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Zent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Brown L added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Senator Johnson
|
|
|