Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 107
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 353: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 329: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Speedy) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Speedy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senator Sandlin added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2023
|
Authored by Senator Freeman
|
|
|