Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senator Raatz added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senator Busch added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/30/2023 | Senators Bassler and Crider added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Senator Deery added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Walker G added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senator Walker K |