Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0309 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 309
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 12-7-2-63.5; IC 12-11-16.
77 Synopsis: Direct service provider registry. Requires the division of
88 disability and rehabilitative services (division) to establish and
99 maintain a direct support professional registry. Requires a direct
1010 support professional to register with the division in order to provide
1111 direct support services. Requires the division to consult with
1212 stakeholders and establish a tiered training certification program for
1313 direct support professionals. Requires the division to issue a request for
1414 proposals before October 1, 2023, to operate the training program and
1515 select a vendor. Allows the division to use any federal dollars available
1616 for the registry and training. Requires the division to apply to the
1717 federal government for approval of Medicaid reimbursement for
1818 services provided by a direct support professional during training.
1919 Effective: Upon passage.
2020 Yoder
2121 January 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children
2222 Services.
2323 2023 IN 309—LS 6841/DI 104 Introduced
2424 First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
2525 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2626 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2727 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2828 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2929 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
3030 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
3131 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3232 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3333 between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3434 SENATE BILL No. 309
3535 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3636 human services.
3737 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3838 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-7-2-63.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3939 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
4040 3 UPON PASSAGE]: Sec. 63.5. "Direct support professional", for
4141 4 purposes of IC 12-11-16, has the meaning set forth in
4242 5 IC 12-11-16-1.
4343 6 SECTION 2. IC 12-11-16 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
4444 7 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
4545 8 UPON PASSAGE]:
4646 9 Chapter 16. Direct Support Professional Registry and Training
4747 10 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "direct support professional"
4848 11 means a provider who provides hands on services to an individual
4949 12 with an intellectual disability or a developmental disability to allow
5050 13 the individual to live in the least restrictive setting possible.
5151 14 Sec. 2. (a) The division shall establish and maintain a direct
5252 15 support professional registry for direct support professionals. The
5353 16 registry must:
5454 17 (1) include a list of direct support professionals who have
5555 2023 IN 309—LS 6841/DI 104 2
5656 1 registered with the division in the manner required by the
5757 2 division;
5858 3 (2) be available in an electronic format for:
5959 4 (A) staff of the office of the secretary; and
6060 5 (B) providers of developmental disability services;
6161 6 to determine whether an individual on the registry has a
6262 7 substantiated incident and the level of severity of the
6363 8 substantiated incident; and
6464 9 (3) contain any substantiated complaints determined by the
6565 10 division for a direct support professional included on the
6666 11 registry.
6767 12 (b) The division may charge an individual a fee for registration
6868 13 and renewal of registration for the direct support professional
6969 14 registry.
7070 15 (c) The division shall establish the following:
7171 16 (1) An application to be used for an individual to register for
7272 17 the direct support professional registry and renew the
7373 18 individual's registration for the registry.
7474 19 (2) A registration and renewal fee for the registry.
7575 20 (3) A process for a consumer to file a complaint with the
7676 21 division concerning a direct support professional.
7777 22 (4) The process in which the division will investigate and
7878 23 substantiate complaints.
7979 24 (5) An appeals process as provided in IC 4-21.5 for a direct
8080 25 support professional concerning a complaint in which the
8181 26 division has determined the complaint against a direct
8282 27 support professional is substantiated.
8383 28 (d) Beginning September 1, 2023, and thereafter, an individual
8484 29 may not provide direct support services as a direct support
8585 30 professional in Indiana unless the individual is registered by the
8686 31 division for the registry under this chapter.
8787 32 (e) The division may adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 necessary to
8888 33 implement the registry and complaint investigation procedure.
8989 34 Sec. 3. (a) Before August 1, 2023, the division shall consult with
9090 35 stakeholders who do not have a conflict of interest to do the
9191 36 following:
9292 37 (1) Establish standards of a competency based training
9393 38 curriculum for direct support professionals.
9494 39 (2) Develop procedures to improve incident reporting
9595 40 concerning direct support professionals.
9696 41 (b) The training curriculum established under this section must
9797 42 include a tiered approach to training that consists of the following:
9898 2023 IN 309—LS 6841/DI 104 3
9999 1 (1) General education and training in providing direct
100100 2 support to individuals with intellectual disabilities or
101101 3 developmental disabilities with the issuance of a certificate
102102 4 upon successful completion of a standardized test.
103103 5 (2) Specialized subcategories of additional direct support
104104 6 professional training to allow for advanced learning and
105105 7 enable career growth in the provision of direct support
106106 8 services.
107107 9 (c) Not later than six (6) months after the implementation by the
108108 10 division of the training program for direct support professionals of
109109 11 competency based training described in subsection (b)(1), an
110110 12 individual, in addition to being registered under section 2 of this
111111 13 chapter, must have successfully completed the training and been
112112 14 certified in order to provide direct support services in Indiana.
113113 15 Sec. 4. (a) Before October 1, 2023, the division shall issue a
114114 16 request for proposals in compliance with IC 5-22-9 seeking bids to
115115 17 operate the training program with the established standards
116116 18 determined under section 3 of this chapter.
117117 19 (b) The division shall make every effort to contract with a
118118 20 vendor from the request for proposals issued under subsection (a)
119119 21 not later than January 31, 2024.
120120 22 Sec. 5. The division may use any federal dollars available for the
121121 23 implementation of this chapter.
122122 24 Sec. 6. (a) Before August 30, 2023, the office of the secretary
123123 25 shall apply to the United States Department of Health and Human
124124 26 Services for any Medicaid waiver necessary to allow for Medicaid
125125 27 reimbursement for Medicaid waiver covered services provided to
126126 28 a Medicaid waiver recipient by a registered direct support
127127 29 professional when training described in section 3(b)(1) of this
128128 30 chapter:
129129 31 (1) is being conducted, but has not been completed; and
130130 32 (2) has been completed;
131131 33 by the direct support professional.
132132 34 (b) This section expires December 31, 2023.
133133 35 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
134134 2023 IN 309—LS 6841/DI 104