House | 03/06/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Cosponsor: Representative Culp K | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Morrison | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senator Bassler added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senator Zay |