House | 04/11/2023 | Placed back on second reading | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Amendment #9 (Meltzer) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 60, nays 29 | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Amendment #6 (Teshka) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Second reading: call withdrawn | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Amendment #5 (Teshka) motion withdrawn | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Senator Baldwin added as second author | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Cosponsor: Representative King J | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Teshka | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Amendment #1 (Zay) prevailed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senator Zay |