Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 184
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 473: yeas 38, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 433: yeas 94, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Representatives Harris and Hatcher added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #5 (Smith V) motion withdrawn voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Hatcher) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Amendment #7 (Harris) ruled out of order voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senator Charbonneau added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Senator Mishler
|
|
|