Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 42
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 261: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Crider added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Jeter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 68: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Senator Messmer
|
|
|