House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Cosponsors: Representatives Ledbetter C, Clere, Gore M | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Judy | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 47, nays 2 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Senator Young M added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senators Donato, Crider, Yoder added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Ford J.D. added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senators Becker and Leising |