Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 45
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 324: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 284: yeas 81, nays 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Rowray E added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Raatz added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Johnson added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Carbaugh and Heine
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative King
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senator Buck added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Brown L added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|